Global Patent Index - EP 0982468 B1

EP 0982468 B1 2003-06-04 - Method for wrapping a cable around a pipe construction and pipe construction assembly

Title (en)

Method for wrapping a cable around a pipe construction and pipe construction assembly

Title (de)

Verfahren um ein Kabel um einen Rohraufbau zu wickeln und Rohraufbaueinrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour enrouler un câble autour d'une construction de tuyau et arrangement de construction de tuyau

Publication

EP 0982468 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98202877 A

Priority

EP 98202877 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0982468A1] The invention relates to a method for wrapping a cable around a pipe construction, in particular a method for wrapping an umbilical around a flow line such as flexible or a rigid riser. In one embodiment the umbilical is connected to the riser at first and second spaced apart connection points. The cable length extending between the connection points is larger than the distance therebetween such that the cable can be wrapped around the riser several times. Thereafter, the umbilical is fixed against the riser at the third connection point located between the first two points. The present invention provides a quick and cheap way of wrapping the umbilical around the flow line and allows for exchange of flow line parts or the umbilical without disassembling the complete flow line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/01; B65H 81/06; E21B 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 81/06 (2006.01); E21B 17/01 (2006.01); E21B 19/00 (2006.01); E21B 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 81/06 (2013.01); E21B 17/01 (2013.01); E21B 19/002 (2013.01); E21B 19/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982468 A1 20000301; EP 0982468 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040828

2004-08-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040828

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-08-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030818

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEMOEL, MARC

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI