Global Patent Index - EP 0982470 A3

EP 0982470 A3 2000-09-06 - Method for building a well

Title (en)

Method for building a well

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bau eines Brunnens

Title (fr)

Methode pour construire un puits

Publication

EP 0982470 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116315 A

Priority

DE 19839340 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0982470A2] First the vertical shaft (1) is sunk and filled at the bottom with filtering gravel (5). The horizontal bore (6,7), with entrance (8) and outlet (9) at the surface is executed in a way, that it passes through the bottom of the vertical shaft within the gravel filled area. A filter pipe segment (4) is inserted into the horizontal bore and a vertical filter pipe with adjacent top pipe work (10) is inserted into the vertical shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 43/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/02 (2006.01); E21B 43/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/305 (2013.01); E21B 43/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982470 A2 20000301; EP 0982470 A3 20000906; DE 19839340 C1 20000621

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010303

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI