Global patent index - EP 0982471 A2

EP 0982471 A2 2000-03-01 - Automated soil sampling system

Title (en)

Automated soil sampling system

Title (de)

System zur automatisierten Bodenprobenentnahme

Title (fr)

Système automatisé pour le prélevement d'échantillons de sol

Publication

EP 0982471 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115709 A

Priority

DE 19838200 A

Abstract (en)

The system has at least one extraction vehicle and a drilling and soil specimen extraction arrangement with at least one drilling device (10,20,40,60) with a spiral drill (60), an emptying device (70) and a collection container (80) and a controller. The controller prevents the vehicle from moving whilst the spiral drill is drilling. Independent claims are also included for an arrangement and a method for extracting earth samples.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Bodenprobenentnahmevorrichtung kann der Spiralbohrer (60) folgende Funktion ausführen: Drehen des Spiralbohrers (60) in beide Drehrichtungen und, Anheben des Spiralbohrers (60) aus dem Boden. Ein Behälter (80) für das Probematerial ist seitlich unter den Spiralbohrer (60) verschiebbar, wenn der Spiralbohrer (60) sich in einer angehobenen Stellung befindet. Ein Ausräummittel (70) räumt den Spiralbohrer (60) in den Behälter (80) aus. Eine Kontrolleinrichtung erfaßt folgende Daten: Position der Bodenprobenentnahmevorrichtung (100) und die Bohrtiefe. Eine Steuereinrichtung ist so eingerichtet, daß beim Erreichen einer zuvor bestimmten Bohrtiefe des Spiralbohrers (60) den Bohrvorgang beendet und durch Anheben aus dem Boden heraus gezogen wird, -der Behälter (80) für das Probematerial nach dem Anheben des Spiralbohrers (60) und den Spiralbohrer (60) geschoben wird, und der Spiralbohrer (60) durch das Ausräummittel (70) in den Behälter (80) für das Probematerial entleert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 44/00; E21B 49/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 44/00 (2006.01); E21B 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 44/00 (2013.01); E21B 49/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DK ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982471 A2 20000301; EP 0982471 A3 20001011; DE 19838200 A1 20000309; DE 19838200 C2 20010201

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2001-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DK ES FR GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 21B 44/00 A, 7E 21B 49/02 B, 7E 21B 7/00 B, 7E 21B 12/06 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DK ES FR GB

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI