Global Patent Index - EP 0982475 A1

EP 0982475 A1 2000-03-01 - Axial flow turbomachine with shrouded blading

Title (en)

Axial flow turbomachine with shrouded blading

Title (de)

Beschaufelung einer axial durchströmten Turbomaschine mit Deckbändern

Title (fr)

Turbomachine à écoulement axial avec aubage caréné

Publication

EP 0982475 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810855 A

Priority

EP 98810855 A

Abstract (en)

The blade cover bands (16,23) on the side facing the seal have a cylindrical contour and are so constructed that on the outflow side of the blade grid there is a radial cover with the stator (8) and the rotor (7). The constructional system ensures that the outlet cavities (42) of the seals are covered and downstream from the seals there is a cylindrical ring gap (44), through which the leakage flow with corresponding dimensioning of the gap geometry is fed in laminar fashion into the flow channel.

Abstract (de)

Der Strömungskanal einer axial durchströmten Turbomaschine wird so konturiert, dass zwischen den Schaufelgittern LE, LA eine zylindrische Mischstrecke 53 entsteht. Die Schaufeldeckbänder 16,23 erhalten auf der der Dichtung zugewandten Seite ebenfalls eine zylinderförmige Kontur, und werden so eingebaut, dass an der Abströmseite der Schaufelgitter eine radiale Überdeckung mit dem Stator 8 bzw. dem Rotor 7 vorhanden ist. Hierdurch werden die Austrittskavitäteten 42 der Dichtungen abgedeckt, und es entsteht stromab der Dichtungen ein zylinderförmiger Ringspalt 44, durch den die Leckageströmung bei entsprechender Dimensionierung der Spaltgeometrie laminar und gerichtet in den Strömungskanal zurückgeführt wird. Störende Wechselwirkungen zwischen der Leckageströmung und der Hauptströmung werden auf ein Minimum reduziert. Die Eintrittskavitäten 18 hingegen bleiben vorzugsweise offen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/14; F04D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/08 (2006.01); F01D 5/14 (2006.01); F04D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/143 (2013.01); F04D 19/028 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0799973 A1 19971008 - ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982475 A1 20000301; JP 2000073705 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010203

2000-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI