Global Patent Index - EP 0982495 A1

EP 0982495 A1 2000-03-01 - Method for the determination of the ion proportion after a combustion stroke in an auto-ignited internal-combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for the determination of the ion proportion after a combustion stroke in an auto-ignited internal-combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Ionenanteiles nach einem Verbrennungsvorgang in einer selbstzündenden Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer le taux d'ionisation après la combustion dans un moteur à combustion interne à allumage spontané

Publication

EP 0982495 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113437 A

Priority

DE 19838223 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves applying an alternating electrical voltage, or a voltage with an alternating component, to two electrodes (3,6) inside at least one cylinder. The measurement value is evaluated as a voltage across a measurement resistance. An ion current is derived by subjecting the voltage to a low pass filter.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Ionenanteiles nach einem Verbrennungsvorgang in einer selbstzündenden Brennkraftmaschine, bei dem sich im Inneren wenigstens eines Zylinders zwei Elektroden befinden, an die eine elektrische Spannung anlegbar ist, wobei die Spannung eine Wechselspannung ist oder einen Wechselspannungsanteil hat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 17/12; F02D 35/02; F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 35/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02P 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 17/12 (2013.01); F02D 35/021 (2013.01); F02P 19/028 (2013.01); F02P 2017/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838223 A1 20000224; DE 19838223 C2 20030206; EP 0982495 A1 20000301; EP 0982495 B1 20030903; EP 1286047 A2 20030226; US 6348799 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140710

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140710

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906834

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140710

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906834

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130730

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906834 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991029

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI