Global Patent Index - EP 0982501 A1

EP 0982501 A1 2000-03-01 - EMBEDDED AIR EXTRACTOR

Title (en)

EMBEDDED AIR EXTRACTOR

Title (de)

EINGEBETTETER LUFTENTFERNER

Title (fr)

EXTRACTEUR D'AIR ENCASTRABLE

Publication

EP 0982501 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950118 A

Priority

  • ES 9800290 W
  • ES 9702753 U

Abstract (en)

The extractor has: ÄaÜ a supporting casing of insulating material provided with a cylindrical part; and a laminar part (2) in integral arrangement at right angles to the axis of the cylindrical part (1); an impeller (6) fitted with blades acting as a fan; an electric motor (5); and an electronic circuit (7); ÄbÜ a cylindrical part (1) having a cavity partially occupied by a coaxial cylindrical body (3) in which are housed the impeller (6), the electric motor (5) and the electronic circuit (7); the cylindrical part (1) and the cylindrical body (3) are linked by radial arms (4); and, between the part (1) and the body (3), there is a passage which surrounds said body (3); and ÄcÜ a laminar part (2) which on its perimeter, has an elastic section which extends beyond this perimeter and which can be anchored in a removable manner in a groove (21) on a side edge (16) of a front cover, the latter being in the form of a thin bowl and which is provided with an opening (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922145A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982501 A1 20000301; EP 0982501 B1 20031210; DE 69820434 D1 20040122; DE 69820434 T2 20041007; ES 1038510 U 19980701; ES 1038510 Y 19990101; WO 9922145 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081027

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-09-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820434 P 20040122

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020905

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990614

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL