Global Patent Index - EP 0982533 A3

EP 0982533 A3 2001-01-03 - Ornamental light having a flower shape

Title (en)

Ornamental light having a flower shape

Title (de)

Zierleuchte in Blumenform

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' éclairage décoratif en forme de fleur

Publication

EP 0982533 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109063 A

Priority

DE 29815260 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0982533A2] The decoration light includes a carrier, an artificial flower, a flexible reed shaft which connects the carrier with the artificial flower, and a flexible support rod which is pulled through the flexible reed shaft and connects the artificial flower with the carrier. The flexible support rod consists of a flexible wire and an insulating layer on it. A lamp is inserted in the artificial flower, and an electric supply is drawn through the flexible reed shaft and is connected to the lamp, to supply it with electric current.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41G 1/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41G 1/005 (2013.01); F21W 2121/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982533 A2 20000301; EP 0982533 A3 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041201

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI