Global Patent Index - EP 0982535 A1

EP 0982535 A1 2000-03-01 - Headlamp comprising an ellipsoidal light reflector and a pivotable shade

Title (en)

Headlamp comprising an ellipsoidal light reflector and a pivotable shade

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfer mit elliptischem Reflektor und mit einer schwenkbaren Blende

Title (fr)

Projecteur du type elliptique à cache basculant pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0982535 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401678 A

Priority

FR 9810246 A

Abstract (en)

The elliptical headlamp has a light source (11), an elliptical reflector (20), a convergent lens and a moving mask (50) between the reflector and the lens. The mask is displaced between two positions by an actuator (60,61) and has a spring to hold it in the first position when the actuator is released. The mask is shaped so that it tends to fall into the first position under gravity.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un projecteur pour véhicule automobile, comprenant une source lumineuse (11), un réflecteur (20) du genre elliptique, une lentille convergente, un cache (50) mobile prévu entre le réflecteur et la lentille, qui présente un bord (51) définissant un profil de coupure particulier pour le faisceau lumineux émis, et des moyens d'actionnement (60, 61) du cache pour l'amener sélectivement dans deux positions, une première position et une seconde position route. Selon l'invention, lesdits moyens d'actionnement comprennent un moyen de manoeuvre relié au cache et apte à être entraîné pour faire basculer ledit cache de la première position à la seconde position et pourvu d'un ressort de rappel pour placer le cache dans la première position lorsque ledit moyen de manoeuvre est libéré, et en ce que le cache est conformé de manière à ce que son centre de gravité soit positionné de façon déterminée par rapport à l'axe de pivotement du cache de telle sorte que ledit cache a tendance intrinsèquement à se placer dans la première position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 14/08; F21V 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/16 (2006.01); F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1778 (2013.01); F21S 48/145 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2782147 A1 20000211; FR 2782147 B1 20010202; DE 69935763 D1 20070524; DE 69935763 T2 20071227; EP 0982535 A1 20000301; EP 0982535 B1 20070411; ES 2285822 T3 20071116

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130706

2014-09-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140905

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130705

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69935763

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120713

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2285822 T3

2007-11-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070411

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69935763 P 20070524

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991215

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI