Global Patent Index - EP 0982536 A2

EP 0982536 A2 2000-03-01 - Building set for lighting fixtures

Title (en)

Building set for lighting fixtures

Title (de)

Bausatz für Leuchten

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'éléments pour la formation de lampes

Publication

EP 0982536 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115681 A

Priority

DE 29815480 U

Abstract (en)

The kit has a mounting module (2) for fixing the light with connecting clamps for connection to electrical leads and associated plug contacts, a lamp module (5) and at least one housing module. The lamp module has holders (6,7) for holding and electrically supplying a lamp (8) and a second set of plug contacts that reversibly connect the lamp and mounting modules whilst simultaneously connecting the first and second sets of plug contacts. The housing module accommodates a replaceable plate that is illuminated by the lamp. An independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Bausatz für Leuchten bereitzustellen, durch den in schneller und preisgünstiger Weise Leuchten unterschiedlichen Leuchtendesigns und/oder Größe herstellbar sind, umfaßt der Bausatz (1) zumindest ein Montagemodul (2) zur Befestigung der Leuchte mit elektrischen Zuleitungen verbindbaren Anschlußklemmen (3) und mit diesen zugeordneten ersten Steckkontakten (4); ein Lampenmodul (5) mit Fassungen (6,7) zur Halterung und elektrischen Versorgung einer Lampe (8) und mit zweiten Steckkontakten (9), welches Lampenmodul (5) mit dem Montagemodul (2) unter gleichzeitiger elektrischer Kontaktierung der ersten und zweiten Steckkontakte (4,9) lösbar verbindbar ist, und wenigstens ein für die jeweilige Leuchte charakteristisches und mit dem Montagemodul (2) und/oder Lampenmodul (5) lösbar verbindbares Gehäusemodul (10), in welchem insbesondere austauschbar eine von der Lampe (8) beleuchtete Scheibe (11) einsetzbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/12 (2006.01); F21V 17/16 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/02 (2006.01); F21V 23/02 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01); F21W 111/00 (2006.01); F21Y 103/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/06 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21V 17/12 (2013.01); F21V 17/164 (2013.01); F21V 23/02 (2013.01); F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815480 U1 20000105; AT 391886 T 20080415; DE 59914719 D1 20080521; EP 0982536 A2 20000301; EP 0982536 A3 20020403; EP 0982536 B1 20080409

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-27 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: VIA LUGANETTO 3, 6962 LUGANO (CH)

2009-03-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090112

2008-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914719 P 20080521

2008-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.P.A.

2008-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2008-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2004-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CEAG NOTLICHTSYSTEME GMBH

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 15/00 A, 7G 09F 13/04 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI