Global Patent Index - EP 0982544 A1

EP 0982544 A1 2000-03-01 - Burner arrangement for a gas turbine

Title (en)

Burner arrangement for a gas turbine

Title (de)

Brenneranordnung für eine Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Brûleur pour une turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 0982544 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810851 A

Priority

EP 98810851 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6209327B1] A burner arrangement (20) for a gas turbine comprises an interior space (22) enclosed by a casing (23), in which interior space (22) at least one burner (21) is arranged, and into which interior space (22) in each case a jet (26, 27) of a gaseous medium, in particular air, is sprayed through at least two nozzle openings (24, 25) against the direction of flow of the burner (21) and along the inner wall (23a) of the casing (23) which jets (26, 27), guided by the inner wall (23a), meet one another from opposite directions and combine to form a secondary flow (28) flowing off perpendicularly from the inner wall (23a). In such a burner arrangement, the flow is stabilized and evened out by virtue of the fact that, to establish the impingement point of the jets (26, 27), a dividing plate (29) arranged in the flow path of the jets (26, 27) and disposed essentially perpendicularly to the inner wall (23a) is provided.

Abstract (de)

Eine Brenneranordnung (20) für eine Gasturbine umfasst einen von einem Gehäuse (23) umschlossenen Innenraum (22), in welchem wenigstens ein Brenner (21) angeordnet ist, und in welchen durch wenigstens zwei Düsenöffnungen (24, 25) entgegen der Strömungsrichtung des Brenners (21) und entlang der Innenwand (23a) des Gehäuses (23) jeweils ein Strahl (26, 27) eines gasförmigen Mediums, insbesondere Luft, eingedüst wird, welche Strahlen (26, 27) durch die Innenwand (23a) geführt aus entgegengesetzten Richtungen aufeinandertreffen und sich zu einer senkrecht von der Innenwand (23a) abströmenden Sekundärströmung (28) vereinigen. Bei einer solchen Brenneranordnung wird eine Stabilisierung und Vergleichmässigung der Strömung dadurch erreicht, dass zur Festlegung des Auftreffpunktes der Strahlen (26, 27) eine im Strömungsweg der Strahlen (26, 27) angeordnete, im wesentlichen senkrecht zur Innenwand (23a) stehenden Trennplatte (29) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23M 9/02; F23C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/02 (2006.01); F23M 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/02 (2013.01); F23M 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0692675 A2 19960117 - ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982544 A1 20000301; EP 0982544 B1 20030618; DE 59808762 D1 20030724; US 6209327 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808762

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808762

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808762

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808762

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808762

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808762

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808762 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FISCHER, JOCHEM

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLER, JAKOB, PROF. DR.

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, ULF CHRISTIAN

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REISS, FRANK

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHIESSEL, PIRMIN

2000-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI