Global patent index - EP 0982556 A1

EP 0982556 A1 2000-03-01 - Method and device for feeding ammunition to revolving-cannon guns

Title (en)

Method and device for feeding ammunition to revolving-cannon guns

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Munitionszuführung bei Revolverkanonen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'alimentation en munitions pour canon-révolver

Publication

EP 0982556 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103102 A

Priority

CH 173198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6345562B1] Cartridges (5) are guided during a loading phase shortly before reaching the automatic cannon (1) onto a first track, which differs from the conveying direction of the conveyor chain (14) and are guided at a greater distance from the revolving drum (13) around the shaft (15) of the revolving drum, and conveyed on. In a firing phase, the cartridges (5) are guided shortly before reaching the automatic cannon (1) onto a second track, which differs from the conveying direction of the conveyor chain (14), are guided around the shaft (15) of the revolving drum (13), and are sequentially brought into a firing position directly behind the revolving drum. After having been fired and ejected, the empty cartridge cases (6) are caught and are transported on the first track into a magazine (4).

Abstract (de)

Bei diesem Verfahren werden die Patronen (5) während einer Ladephase kurz vor Erreichen der Revolverkanone (1) in eine erste, von der Förderrichtung der Förderkette (14) abweichende Bahn gelenkt und in grösserem Abstand von der Revolvertrommel (13) um deren Achse (15) geführt und weiter transportiert. Die Patronen (5) werden in einer Schiessphase kurz vor Erreichen der Revolverkanone (1) in eine zweite, von der Förderrichtung der Förderkette (14) abweichende Bahn gelenkt, um die Achse (15) der Revolvertrommel (13) geführt und unmittelbar hinter dieser nacheinander in eine Schiessstellung gebracht. Die leeren Patronenhülsen (6) werden nach dem Schiessen und Auswerfen aufgefangen und auf der ersten Bahn in ein Magazin (4) transportiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 9/04; F41A 9/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/04 (2006.01); F41A 9/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/82 (2013.01); F41A 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

CH 670852 A5 19890714 - CHARLES DELITROZ

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982556 A1 20000301; EP 0982556 B1 20021204; DE 59903630 D1 20030116; ES 2189293 T3 20030701; US 6345562 B1 20020212

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040218

2005-02-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-09-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189293

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030400252

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-02-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030212

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030121

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030116

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903630

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-16

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB GR IT LI

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020409

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES GB GR IT LI

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OERLIKON CONTRAVES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB GR IT LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI