Global Patent Index - EP 0982689 A1

EP 0982689 A1 2000-03-01 - Apparatus for authenticating banknotes

Title (en)

Apparatus for authenticating banknotes

Title (de)

Gerät zur Echtheitsprüfung von Banknoten

Title (fr)

Appareil pour contrôler l'authenticité de billets de banque

Publication

EP 0982689 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123434 A

Priority

DE 29815401 U

Abstract (en)

The checker comprises an ultra violet lamp (2) in a housing (1). The housing is plate-shaped and the lamp extends along one edge of the housing. The housing is dimensioned to the size of an ISO standard identity card. The power supply to the lamp is a battery or rechargeable battery. The lamp has a protective cover (7), which can be lifted up, e.g. when a switch (3) for turning on the lamp is operated. The housing may have a hole for attachment to a key ring.

Abstract (de)

Ein Gerät zur Echtheitsprüfung von Banknoten weist ein kartenförmiges Gehäuse (1) mit einer UV-Lampe (2) entlang einer Kante des Gehäuses (1) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/128 (2013.01); G07D 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815401 U1 19981126; EP 0982689 A1 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020509

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011029

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI