Global Patent Index - EP 0982693 A2

EP 0982693 A2 2000-03-01 - Method to identify user-relevant states of the misoperation counter

Title (en)

Method to identify user-relevant states of the misoperation counter

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Identifizieren anwenderbezogener Zustände eines Fehlzählers

Title (fr)

Méthode pour l'identification des états relatifs à l'utilisateur d'un compteur d'erreurs

Publication

EP 0982693 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99116600 A

Priority

DE 19839041 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention describes a method to identity and display states of the misoperation counter prior to input of a password. The method checks the state of the misoperation counter prior to every new password input. Each scanned state is assigned a defined state, which is signaled visually or acoustically to the user by the chipcard application prior to input of the password. The visual display is preferentially in the form of a traffic light, in which the colors green, amber and red are assigned to a defined state of the misoperation counter. The user of password-protected objects and/or applications is unambiguously informed of the state of the protective device for passwords by means of a clearly presented display. Especially after the card has been lost and then found again, the user can see whether anyone else has attempted to enter a password. Prior to the last chance of entering the correct password the user is clearly warned, and can check the input device again carefully before input.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/14 (2006.01); G06F 21/24 (2006.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/10 (2013.01); G07F 7/1083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982693 A2 20000301; EP 0982693 A3 20040414; DE 19839041 A1 20000302; DE 19839041 C2 20030327; JP 2000076134 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050125

2005-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI