Global Patent Index - EP 0982704 A3

EP 0982704 A3 2000-11-15 - Information display device, particularly advertising and/or graphic indicia

Title (en)

Information display device, particularly advertising and/or graphic indicia

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Präsentation von Informationen, insbesondere Werbetexten und/oder - grafiken

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage pour informations, en particulier publicité et/ou signes graphiques

Publication

EP 0982704 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116377 A

Priority

DE 29815073 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6161319A] A lighted, rotatable display device for presenting advertising or other information is disclosed which includes a hollow transparent member supported for rotation on a drive motor. The drive motor includes a shaft extending into the hollow member and a light bulb is mounted on the shaft. Light from the light bulb makes information on the surface of the hollow member visible as the hollow member rotates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/02 (2013.01); Y10S 362/812 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815073 U1 19981105; DE 59914273 D1 20070510; EP 0982704 A2 20000301; EP 0982704 A3 20001115; EP 0982704 B1 20070328; US 6161319 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59914273

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130225

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-10-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914273 P 20070510

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RINK, ANDREAS

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ILLMANN, KLAUS

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RINK, ANDREAS

2006-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RINK, ANDREAS

2006-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ILLMANN, KLAUS

2001-09-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI