Global Patent Index - EP 0982747 A2

EP 0982747 A2 2000-03-01 - Safety switch

Title (en)

Safety switch

Title (de)

Sicherheitsschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur de sécurité

Publication

EP 0982747 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124187 A

Priority

  • DE 19649717 A
  • EP 97951250 A

Abstract (en)

The safety switch includes a switch casing (1), at least one key channel (3, 5) in the switch casing, in which a key (7) is insertable from the exterior, and a control disk (9) which projects into the key channel, and which is rotated at insertion of the key, whereby devices (15, 19, 25) are provided for a fixture of the control disk at completely inserted key. The devices for the fixture of the control disk consist preferably of at least one extrusion (19) on the control disk, which engages with a locking element (25) which is movable with respect to the control disk.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Sicherheitsschalter mit einem Schaltergehäuse (1), zwei nicht parallel zueinander verlaufenden Schlüsselkanälen (3, 5) im Schaltergehäuse (1), in die von außen ein Schlüssel (7) einführbar ist, und einer Steuerscheibe (9), die in die Schlüsselkanäle (3, 5) ragt und sich beim Einführen des Schlüssels (7) dreht, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß ein entlang einer Winkelhalbierenden der Schlüsselkanäle (3, 5) bewegliches Betätigungsglied bei nicht eingeführtem Schlüssel (7) in beide Schlüsselkanäle ragt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/42 (2006.01); H01H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 27/002 (2013.01); H01H 2027/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19649717 A1 19980604; AT 201115 T 20010515; AT 231649 T 20030215; EP 0941549 A1 19990915; EP 0941549 B1 20010509; EP 0982747 A2 20000301; EP 0982747 A3 20001122; EP 0982747 B1 20030122; EP 1077457 A2 20010221; EP 1077457 A3 20010314; EP 1077457 B1 20021211; JP 2001504981 A 20010410; US 6084185 A 20000704; WO 9825284 A1 19980611

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59709207

- Representative's name: RUCKH, RAINER, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091120

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EUCHNER G.M.B.H. + CO.

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-05-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709207 P 20030227

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 941549

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAECHLE, ERIK

2002-07-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020429

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 941549

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI