Global Patent Index - EP 0982754 A1

EP 0982754 A1 2000-03-01 - Self-biasing collector elements for linear-beam microwave tubes

Title (en)

Self-biasing collector elements for linear-beam microwave tubes

Title (de)

Selbstpolarisierende Kollektorelemente für Linearstrahl-Mikrowellenröhre

Title (fr)

Eléments collecteurs auto-polarisants pour tubes à micro-ondes à faisceau rectiligne

Publication

EP 0982754 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98116081 A

Priority

EP 98116081 A

Abstract (en)

A self biasing element (102) is formed by coupling an electron accumulator (104) to a collector stage (106) of a linear-beam microwave tube with a base (112) which has a selected resistance. The electron accumulator has a secondary emission coefficient less than one and is positioned to intercept a portion of the electrons in the electron beam of the linear-beam microwave tube. The electron accumulator thus acquires a negative voltage whose magnitude is controlled by selecting the base resistance and the radial and axial position of the self biasing element within the collector. Various arrangements of self biasing elements and collector stages are disclosed which improve the efficiency and RF performance of the microwave tube. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 23/027; H01J 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 23/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 23/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] FR 2742580 A1 19970620 - THOMSON CSF [FR]
  • [A] "Graphite Multistage Depressed Collector for Microwave Tubes", NASA TECH BRIEFS., no. 164, March 1988 (1988-03-01), Springfields, VA, USA, XP002084136

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982754 A1 20000301; EP 0982754 B1 20040421; DE 69823348 D1 20040527; DE 69823348 T2 20050324

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050826

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-01-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-09-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-08-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050826

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040818

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823348 P 20040527

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030129

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI