Global Patent Index - EP 0982757 A1

EP 0982757 A1 2000-03-01 - Carrier gas separator for mass spectroscopy

Title (en)

Carrier gas separator for mass spectroscopy

Title (de)

Trägergas-Separator für Massenspektrometrie

Title (fr)

Séparateur du gaz porteur pour la spectrométrie en masse

Publication

EP 0982757 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98116015 A

Priority

  • EP 98116015 A
  • JP 23879098 A

Abstract (en)

A system for separating certain ions from an ion beam in a mass spectrometer. A magnetic or electrostatic field is applied at an angle to the ion beam, causing the ions to disperse according to their mass to charge ratio. The ions are dispersed enough to allow certain ions to be blocked and removed from the beam using a physical stop. A subsequent plurality of fields is then applied to reform the beam and adjust its direction and dispersion. The system can be used to remove carrier gas ions from an ion beam in a gas chromatography-mass spectroscopy instrument. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/04; H01J 49/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/62 (2006.01); G01N 30/72 (2006.01); H01J 49/04 (2006.01); H01J 49/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982757 A1 20000301; JP 2000067807 A 20000303

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020122

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI