Global patent index - EP 0982784 A1

EP 0982784 A1 2000-03-01 - Battery pack for an implantable medical device

Title (en)

Battery pack for an implantable medical device

Title (de)

Energieversorgungsmodul für eine implantierbare Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de batteries pour dispositif médical implantable

Publication

EP 0982784 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121610 A

Priority

DE 19837912 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19837912C1] The energy supply module (58) has an outer housing (80) of a bio-compatible material which contains rechargeable electrochemical batteries (90), for supplying the electrical energy for the main module (56) of the implanted device (54) via a coupling (82). The outer housing receives a hermetically-sealed protective housing (88) or acts as the latter, with an incorporated detector for an unacceptable battery condition operating a switch (94) for preventing recharging or discharging of the batteries.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Energieversorgungsmodul für eine implantierbare Vorrichtung (54), wobei das Energieversorgungsmodul (58) ein biokompatibles Außengehäuse (80) umfaßt, das eine mehrfach nachladbare elektrochemische Batterie (90) aufnimmt, welche ein Hauptmodul (56) der implantierbaren Vorrichtung (54) über ein Koppelorgan (82) mit elektrischer Energie versorgt. Dabei ist das Außengehäuse als hermetisch dichtes Schutzgehäuse ausgebildet oder nimmt ein solches (88) auf. Das Schutzgehäuse (88) weist ein Detektororgan (92) auf, welches ausgelegt oder einstellbar ist, bei einem unzulässigen Betriebszustand der Batterie (90) mindestens ein Schaltorgan (94) zu betätigen, welches ein Nachladen und/oder Entladen der Batterie (90) verhindert. Das Koppelorgan (82) ist vorzugsweise lösbar ausgestaltet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 2/10; A61N 1/362; A61N 1/375; A61N 1/378; H01M 2/34; H01M 6/50; H01M 10/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/48 (2006.01); A61N 1/00 (2006.01); A61N 1/362 (2006.01); A61N 1/375 (2006.01); A61N 1/378 (2006.01); H01M 2/00 (2006.01); H01M 2/02 (2006.01); H01M 2/10 (2006.01); H01M 2/20 (2006.01); H01M 2/34 (2006.01); H01M 6/50 (2006.01); H01M 10/00 (2006.01); H01M 10/44 (2006.01); H02J 7/00 (2006.01); H05K 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/554 (2013.01); H04R 2225/31 (2013.01); H04R 2225/67 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837912 C1 19991028; AT 215739 T 20020415; AU 2601899 A 20000309; AU 751478 B2 20020815; CA 2270683 A1 20000220; CA 2270683 C 20031104; EP 0982784 A1 20000301; EP 0982784 B1 20020403; US 6269266 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041112

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041112

2003-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031125

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031125

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *COCHLEAR LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-07-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-07-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803622

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-08

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-04-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 215739

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COCHLEAR LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMPLEX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT HEARING TECHNOLOGY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI