Global Patent Index - EP 0982793 A3

EP 0982793 A3 2000-08-23 - An aerial mast

Title (en)

An aerial mast

Title (de)

Antennenmast

Title (fr)

Mât d'antenne

Publication

EP 0982793 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99306419 A

Priority

GB 9817652 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2340513A] An aerial mast (10) comprising an upstanding mast part (11,12) having communications means (18,20) at or adjacent the top of the mast and an integral chamber (14) within the mast structure at its base, for housing the mast controls and power supply.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; E04H 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2340513 A 20000223; GB 9817652 D0 19981007; EP 0982793 A2 20000301; EP 0982793 A3 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020805

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 1/12 A, 7E 04H 12/00 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI