Global Patent Index - EP 0982799 A2

EP 0982799 A2 2000-03-01 - Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (en)

Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (de)

Dielektrische Resonatorantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne diélectrique à résonateur

Publication

EP 0982799 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99202591 A

Priority

DE 19837266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2000232317A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To obtain better connection between a dielectric resonator antenna and a transmission line by providing a conductive layer on a symmetry plane, providing an electric contact insulated from the conductive layer on the symmetry plane and using the conductive layer and the electric contact to connect the dielectric resonator antenna to the transmission line so as to transmit or receive a signal. SOLUTION: This dielectric resonator antenna 4 has a 1st metal layer 5 on a symmetry plane. Further, a ceramic parallelopiped of a DRA 4 has a 2nd metal layer 6 on a head end. The layer 6 has a soldering point 7 that is electrically insulated from the layer 5 arranged on the symmetry plane and forms an additional electric contact on the symmetrical plane. For this reason, the symmetry plane where an electric field tangent component of a desired self-mode disappears is covered with a metal layer to be attached to a dielectric medium. The layer 6 is also attached in the same way. These layers 5 to 7 make an electric component solderable on a printed circuit board with a solder bath, etc.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine dielektrische Resonatorantenne DRA (4) mit einer elektrisch leitenden Schicht in einer Symmetrieebene. Um bei einer dielektrischen Resonatorantenne (4) eine bessere Kopplung an eine Zuleitung (9, 10, 11) zu schaffen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß in der Symmetrieebene wenigstens ein, von der elektrisch leitenden Schicht isolierter, elektrischer Kontakt vorgesehen ist, und daß die elektrische Schicht und der elektrische Kontakt zur Verbindung der dielektrischen Resonatorantenne (4) mit wenigstens einer Zuleitung (9, 10, 11) für ein zu sendendes oder zu empfangenes Signal vorgesehen sind. Auf diese Weise entstehen in einer Ebene zwei fest mit der dielektrischen Resonatorantenne (4) verbundene elektrische Kontakte, durch die die Antenne (4) auf einer Platine (PCB) (8) in der bekannten SMD-Technik (Verlöten auf der Oberfläche der Platine) montiert werden kann. Damit wird eine deutlich bessere Einkopplung der Leistung in die Antenne (4) erreicht. Außerdem betrifft sich die Erfindung noch einen Sender und Empfänger mit einer dielektrischen Resonatorantenne (4) mir einer elektrisch leitenden Schicht in einer Symmetrieebene sowie auf ein Mobilfunkgerät mit einer solchen Antenne (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04; H01Q 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/10 (2006.01); H01P 5/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 5/10 (2015.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/242 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0485 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837266 A1 20000224; EP 0982799 A2 20000301; EP 0982799 A3 20010502; EP 0982799 B1 20040526; JP 2000232317 A 20000822; KR 20000017328 A 20000325; TW 431029 B 20010421; US 6323824 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070809

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070809

2006-10-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060829

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-04 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: D6

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-25 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909570

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 9/04 A, 7H 01Q 1/24 B, 7H 01Q 13/24 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI