Global Patent Index - EP 0982799 A3

EP 0982799 A3 2001-05-02 - Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (en)

Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (de)

Dielektrische Resonatorantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne diélectrique à résonateur

Publication

EP 0982799 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99202591 A

Priority

DE 19837266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: KR20000017328A] PURPOSE: A dielectric resonance antenna is provided to improve an impedance matching with the transmission lines. CONSTITUTION: The dielectric resonance antenna has a hexagonal shape and comprises a symmetric plane; a conductive layer disposed on the symmetric plane; and an electrical contact disposed on the symmetric plane and insulated from the conductive layer. The conductive layer and the electrical contact are connected to a transmission line(9, 10, 11) such that signals are transmitted or received. A metal layer(6) can be provided at a side wall normal to the symmetric plane such that it is connected with the electrical contact. The antenna is soldered by lead on a power printed circuit board(8). Thus, the antenna is impedance-matched with the transmission lines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/10 (2006.01); H01P 5/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 5/10 (2015.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/242 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0485 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0790663 A1 19970820 - MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]
  • [X] EP 0767510 A1 19970409 - MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]
  • [Y] DE 3509014 A1 19860918 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [A] PETOSA A ET AL: "RECENT ADVANCES IN DIELECTRIC-RESONATOR ANTENNA TECHNOLOGY", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION MAGAZINE,US,IEEE INC, NEW YORK, vol. 40, no. 3, 1 June 1998 (1998-06-01), pages 35 - 48, XP000774845, ISSN: 1045-9243

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837266 A1 20000224; EP 0982799 A2 20000301; EP 0982799 A3 20010502; EP 0982799 B1 20040526; JP 2000232317 A 20000822; KR 20000017328 A 20000325; TW 431029 B 20010421; US 6323824 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070809

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070809

2006-10-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060829

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-04 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909570 P 20040701

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01Q 9/04 A, 7H 01Q 1/24 B, 7H 01Q 13/24 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI