Global Patent Index - EP 0982811 A3

EP 0982811 A3 2000-10-04 - Female connector for a multipolar connection

Title (en)

Female connector for a multipolar connection

Title (de)

Steckdose für mehrpolige Steckverbindung

Title (fr)

Connecteur femelle pour une connexion multipolaire

Publication

EP 0982811 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108529 A

Priority

DE 29814965 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0982811A2] The plug socket has a socket housing (1) fitted with a contact carrier insert with a number of pin contact sleeves connected to respective electrical leads, secured within the housing via support element. The contact carrier insert, the socket housing mantle (9) and the support element are provided with aligned openings for sidewards insertion of the electrical leads.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/00; H01R 13/436

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/502 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/512 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/10 (2013.01); H01R 13/512 (2013.01); H01R 13/5202 (2013.01); H01R 13/5205 (2013.01); H01R 13/6691 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814965 U1 19981105; DE 59914275 D1 20070510; EP 0982811 A2 20000301; EP 0982811 A3 20001004; EP 0982811 B1 20070328; EP 0982811 B2 20160622; ES 2285802 T3 20071116; ES 2285802 T5 20161201

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Ref Document Number: 2285802

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-28 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

- Ref Legal Event Code: FP

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20160622

2016-06-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2016-06-22 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 59914275

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: WESTFALIA-AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20071221

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: WESTFALIA-AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20071221

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100504

2011-01-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: JAEGER AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20071214

2011-01-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: WESTFALIA-AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20071221

2011-01-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: PLASTIMAT GMBH

- Effective date: 20071222

2008-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: JAEGER AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2008-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: WESTFALIA-AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2008-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PLASTIMAT GMBH

2008-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: JAEGER AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2008-02-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: JAEGER AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20071214

2008-02-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: WESTFALIA-AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-02-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PLASTIMAT GMBH

- Effective date: 20071222

2008-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: JAEGER AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20071214

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *ERICH JAEGER G.M.B.H. + CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: STRASSHEIMER STRASSE 10, D-61169 FRIEDBERG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *ERICH JAEGER G.M.B.H. + CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2285802

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-09-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070627

2007-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ERICH JAEGER GMBH + CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20070509

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914275

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-05-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-05-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ERICH JAEGER GMBH + CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001125

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 24/00 A, 7H 01R 13/436 B

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WIESE, WOLFGANG

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RAUTENBERG, KURT

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI