Global patent index - EP 0982886 A2

EP 0982886 A2 2000-03-01 - Broadcast receiver, in particular broadcast receiver for an automobile, which is capable of receiving Radio Data System (RDS) signals, and method for displaying a programme name of the broadcast programme which is being transmitted on the frequency to which a broadcast receiver capable of receiving RDS signals, is tuned

Title (en)

Broadcast receiver, in particular broadcast receiver for an automobile, which is capable of receiving Radio Data System (RDS) signals, and method for displaying a programme name of the broadcast programme which is being transmitted on the frequency to which a broadcast receiver capable of receiving RDS signals, is tuned

Title (de)

Rundfunkempfänger, insbesondere zum Empfang von Radio-Daten geeigneter Rundfunkempfänger für ein Kraftfahrzeug, und Verfahren zum Anzeigen eines Programmnamens eines über eine momentan an einem zum Empfang von Radio-Daten geeigneten Rundfunkempfänger eingestellte Rundfunksendefrequenz übertragenen Rundfunkprogramms

Title (fr)

Récepteur de programmes de radiodiffusion, en particulier récepteur pour un automobile, capable de capter des signaux RDS, et méthode pour afficher lenom d'un programme actuellement transmis sur la fréquence sur laquelle le récepteur, capable de capter des signaux RDS, est accordé

Publication

EP 0982886 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111200 A

Priority

DE 19838039 A

Abstract (en)

The receiver a memory with locations storing the radio programme identification (PI) names. Additional locations are provided for user-defined programme identification (PS') names. A controller (15) determines if there is a user-defined programme identification for the frequency currently tuned into. In the event that there is no user-defined programme identification name stored for that frequency, the radio receiver display shows the actual programme identification (PI) being transmitted.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Rundfunkempfänger, insbesondere ein zum Empfang von Radio-Daten geeigneter Rundfunkempfänger für ein Kraftfahrzeug, vorgeschlagen, der über einen Speicher zum Ablegen von Rundfunkprogrammen kennzeichnenden Programmkennungen verfügt, der über weitere Speicherplätze zur Ablage von den gespeicherten Programmkennungen zugeordneten benutzerdefinierten Programmnamen verfügt, wobei dann, wenn zu einer empfangenen Rundfunksendefrequenz, beziehungsweise der über die empfangene Rundfunksendefrequenz zugeordneten Programmkennung, ein benutzerdefinierter Programmname abgespeichert ist, dieser vorangig vor einer mittels des über die aktuell empfangene Rundfunksendefrequenz übertragenen Radio-Daten-Signals übertragenen Programmnamen-Information an einer Anzeigeeinheit des Rundfunkempfängers dargestellt wird. Mit dem erfindungsgemäßen Rundfunkempfänger beziehungsweise einem erfindungsgemäßen Verfahren, welches in dem erfindungsgemäßen Rundfunkempfänger abläuft, wird erreicht, daß eine zweckentfremdend zur Anzeige von sonstigen Informationen, wie bespielsweise Laufschriften oder Werbetexten verwendete Programmnamen-Information PS des Radio-Daten-Signals, die eine einwandfreie Identifizierung des über die aktuell empfangene Rundfunksendefrequenz übertragenen Rundfunkprogramms erschwert, durch einen benutzerdefinierten Programmnamen ersetzt wird, so daß eine einwandfreie Identifizierung des gehörten Rundfunkprogramms erleichtert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; H03J 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/44 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/44 (2013.01); H04H 40/00 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838039 A1 20000224; EP 0982886 A2 20000301; EP 0982886 A3 20040121

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20090629

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04H 1/00 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 03J 1/04 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI