Global Patent Index - EP 0982973 A2

EP 0982973 A2 2000-03-01 - Sensor for cooking vessel detection

Title (en)

Sensor for cooking vessel detection

Title (de)

Sensor zur Kochgefässerkennung

Title (fr)

Capteur pour la détection d'un récipient de cuisson

Publication

EP 0982973 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123892 A

Priority

  • DE 19603845 A
  • EP 97100766 A

Abstract (en)

The sensor is the active part of an inductive oscillation circuit that forms part of a controller and pref. operates with detuning. The sensor is arranged as a fixed shape, self-supporting, temp. resistant loop (30) of electrically conducting material near at least one zone (18,19) heated by the heating element (21). An Independent claim is also included for a radiation heating body.

Abstract (de)

Ein elektrischer Strahlungsheizkörper (11) ist mit einer Topferkennung zur Einschaltung einer oder mehrerer Heizzonen (18, 19) ausgebildet. Die Topferkennung (31) arbeitet induktiv nach dem Prinzip der Schwingkreis-Verstimmung. Der Sensor (30) besteht aus einer aus Rohr oder dickem Draht bestehenden, einwindigen Schleife, die im Bereich der Heizzonen (18, 19) über diesen und dicht unter einer Glaskeramikplatte angeordnet ist. Im Falle eines Zweikreisheizkörpers ist die Sensorschleife (30) mit prägnanten Umfangsbereichen (37, 38) in diesen Heizzonen geformt, so daß das Signal einen stufigen Übergang zwischen diesen Zonen hat und somit eine Topfgrößenerkennung in Anpassung an die Heizzonen möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/00 (2006.01); H05B 3/68 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/746 (2013.01); H05B 2213/05 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • EP 0469189 A2 19920205 - OSKAR LOCHER AG [CH]
  • EP 0442275 A2 19910821 - EGO ELEKTRO BLANC & FISCHER [DE]
  • WHITAKKER J.C.: "THE ELECTRONICS HANDBOOK", 1996, CRC PRESS/IEEE PRESS, ISBN: 0-8493-8345-5, article "Antennas for Specific Applications", pages: 1343 - 1344, XP002968664

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0788293 A2 19970806; EP 0788293 A3 19980107; EP 0788293 B1 20010808; AT 204114 T 20010815; AT 263475 T 20040415; DE 19603845 A1 19970807; DE 19603845 B4 20100722; EP 0982973 A2 20000301; EP 0982973 A3 20000503; EP 0982973 B1 20040331; EP 0982973 B2 20090211; EP 1379105 A2 20040107; EP 1379105 A3 20041103; ES 2162136 T3 20011216; ES 2218941 T3 20041116; ES 2218941 T5 20090601; JP H09223572 A 19970826; US 5893996 A 19990413

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130119

2014-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140321

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59711476

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130119

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2009-05-05 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2009-02-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG & CO. KG.

- Effective date: 20041221

2005-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218941 T3

2004-09-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-06-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711476 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0788293 P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GROSS, MARTIN

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PLATT, NILS

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 3/74 A, 7H 05B 1/02 B

2000-03-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 788293

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE