Global patent index - EP 0982976 A1

EP 0982976 A1 2000-03-01 - Closed electron drift plasma thruster adapted to high thermal loads

Title (en)

Closed electron drift plasma thruster adapted to high thermal loads

Title (de)

Auf hohen thermischen Belastungen abgestimmter Plasmamotor mit geschlossenem Elektronendrift

Title (fr)

Propulseur à plasma à dérive fermée d'électrons adapté à de fortes charges thermiques

Publication

EP 0982976 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401981 A

Priority

FR 9810674 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2280479A1] The closed electron drift plasma thruster uses a magnetic circuit to create a magnetic field in a main annular channel (124) for ionization and acceleration, said magnetic circuit comprises: an essentially radial first outer pole piece (134); a conical second outer pole piece (311); an essentially radial first inner pole piece (135); a conical second inner pole piece (351); a plurality of outer magnetic cores (137) surrounded by outer coils (131) to interconnect the first and second outer pole pieces (134, 311); an axial magnetic core (138) surrounded by a first inner coil (133) and connected to the first inner pole piece (135); and a second inner coil (132) placed upstream from the outer coils (131). The thruster also comprises a plurality of radial arms (352, 136) included in the magnetic circuit, and a structural base (175) which is separate from the magnetic circuit and which serves, amongst other things, to cool the coils (131, 132, 133).

Abstract (fr)

Le propulseur à plasma à dérive fermée d'électrons met en oeuvre un circuit magnétique de création d'un champ magnétique dans un canal annulaire principal d'ionisation et d'accélération (124), ce circuit magnétique comprenant : une première pièce polaire externe essentiellement radiale (134), une deuxième pièce polaire externe conique (311), une première pièce polaire interne essentiellement radiale (135), une deuxième pièce polaire interne conique (351), une pluralité de noyaux magnétiques externes (137) entourés de bobines externes (131) pour relier entre elles les première et deuxième pièces polaires externes (134, 311), un noyau magnétique axial (138) entouré d'une première bobine interne (133) et relié à la première pièce polaire interne (135), et une deuxième bobine interne (132) placée en amont des bobines externes (131). Le propulseur comprend en outre une pluralité de bras radiaux (352, 136) inclus dans le circuit magnétique ainsi qu'une embase structurale (175) distincte du circuit magnétique pour assurer entre autres le refroidissement des bobines (131, 132, 133). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 1/54; F03H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03H 1/00 (2006.01); H05H 1/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F03H 1/0075 (2013.01); F03H 1/0031 (2013.01); H05H 1/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982976 A1 20000301; EP 0982976 B1 20040225; CA 2280479 A1 20000225; CA 2280479 C 20071023; DE 69914987 D1 20040401; DE 69914987 T2 20041216; FR 2782884 A1 20000303; FR 2782884 B1 20001124; IL 131182 A 20030624; IL 131182 D0 20010128; JP 2000073937 A 20000307; JP 4347461 B2 20091021; RU 2219371 C2 20031220; US 6281622 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-11-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SNECMA, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69914987

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69914987

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KLUNKER, SCHMITT-NILSON, HIRSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-10-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69914987

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KLUNKER, SCHMITT-NILSON, HIRSCH, DE

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-07-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69914987

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI