Global Patent Index - EP 0983010 A1

EP 0983010 A1 2000-03-08 - CHRISTMAS TREE STAND

Title (en)

CHRISTMAS TREE STAND

Title (de)

WEIHNACHTSBAUMSTÄNDER

Title (fr)

SUPPORT POUR ARBRES DE NOEL

Publication

EP 0983010 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98922780 A

Priority

  • DE 29707643 U
  • EP 9802508 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2287527A1] A mechanical holder is disclosed for holding Christmas trees of various sizes and trunk shapes. This holder consists of a base, a vessel fixed to the base and provided with a centring spike, and several holding elements (3, 3a, 3b, 3c) regularly spaced apart around the vessel. In their holding position above the vessel, the holding elements can swivel independently of each other to align and retain the Christmas tree with their faces towards the axis of symmetry. According to the invention, the Christmas tree stand has a single clamping device (4) which applies to the tree trunk the force required to align and retain the tree over several force transmitting (5, 6) and diverting (8, 9) elements in a manner as uniform as possible, by means of the holding elements (3, 3a, 3b, 3c), compensating for possible irregularities or slanted tree growth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 33/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 33/1213 (2013.01); A47G 2033/122 (2013.01); A47G 2033/1286 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848678A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29707643 U1 19970703; AT 234584 T 20030415; CA 2287527 A1 19981105; CZ 296231 B6 20060215; CZ 9903806 A3 20001011; DE 59807562 D1 20030424; EP 0983010 A1 20000308; EP 0983010 B1 20030319; HU 0001672 A2 20000828; HU 0001672 A3 20001030; PL 186833 B1 20040331; PL 336410 A1 20000619; SK 147699 A3 20001009; US 6283436 B1 20010904; WO 9848678 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070428

2007-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070510

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060412

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2004-04-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031222

2004-02-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-09-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807562

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRINNER INNOVATION GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020612

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHULZ, FARRIBA

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHULZ, RAINER

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL