Global Patent Index - EP 0983078 A1

EP 0983078 A1 2000-03-08 - SIALOADHESIN FAMILY 4 cDNA

Title (en)

SIALOADHESIN FAMILY 4 cDNA

Title (de)

SIALOADHESIN FAMILIE 4 cDNA

Title (fr)

ADNC DE LA FAMILLE DES SIALOADHESINES 4 (SAF-4)

Publication

EP 0983078 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923812 A

Priority

  • US 9810791 W
  • US 4757297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853840A1] The SAF-4 polypeptides and polynucleotides and methods for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques are disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing SAF-4 polypeptides and polynucleotides in therapy, and diagnostic assays for such

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; A61K 39/395; A61K 48/00; C07H 21/04; C07K 14/435; C07K 14/705; C07K 16/00; C07K 16/18; C07K 16/28; C12N 15/01; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/18 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/14 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 33/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853840 A1 19981203; AU 7601698 A 19981230; EP 0983078 A1 20000308; EP 0983078 A4 20030326; JP 2001502359 A 20010220; JP 2004041214 A 20040212

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040118

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-03-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/00 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/435 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/705 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/00 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/18 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/28 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/01 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/12 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/10 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/50 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL