Global Patent Index - EP 0983179 A1

EP 0983179 A1 2000-03-08 - RAIL VEHICLE WITH ENGINE AND WAGON

Title (en)

RAIL VEHICLE WITH ENGINE AND WAGON

Title (de)

SCHIENENFAHRZEUG MIT TRIEBKOPF UND WAGEN

Title (fr)

VEHICULE SUR RAILS A MOTRICE ET WAGON

Publication

EP 0983179 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930701 A

Priority

  • DE 19722309 A
  • EP 9802921 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722309A1] The invention relates to a rail vehicle, comprising at least one engine (1) and an adjacent wagon (2) mounted on a traveling gear. In order to facilitate axle-load compensation, the adjacent ends of the engine (1) and the following wagon body (2) are supported on a common bogie by means of separate elastic support elements (16, 17, 18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 3/10; B61C 17/04; B61F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 17/04 (2006.01); B61D 3/10 (2006.01); B61F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/10 (2013.01); B61C 17/04 (2013.01); B61F 3/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854040A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722309 A1 19981203; DE 19722309 C2 20010419; AT 202523 T 20010715; AU 716083 B2 20000217; AU 8104898 A 19981230; CA 2277777 A1 19981203; CA 2277777 C 20020423; EP 0983179 A1 20000308; EP 0983179 B1 20010627; ES 2159186 T3 20010916; NO 321205 B1 20060403; NO 995087 A 19991018; NO 995087 D0 19991018; US 6276282 B1 20010821; WO 9854040 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120515

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120514

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800936

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120514

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120515

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120514

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120514

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120514

2013-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 202523

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120514

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2011-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-06-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-09-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2159186

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2001-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800936

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-02

2001-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI GB IT LI SE

2001-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 202523

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990427

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI GB IT LI SE