Global Patent Index - EP 0983193 A1

EP 0983193 A1 2000-03-08 - ACCELERATION PROTECTION SUIT

Title (en)

ACCELERATION PROTECTION SUIT

Title (de)

BESCHLEUNIGUNGS-SCHUTZANZUG

Title (fr)

VETEMENT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES EFFETS DE L'ACCELERATION

Publication

EP 0983193 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913056 A

Priority

  • CH 9900159 W
  • CH 90098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954203A1] The active part of the suit is partially comprised of layers (3, 4) one of which facing the body and the other facing away from the body. Both layers are made of a gas-tight, slightly stretchable textile material and are connected to one another at connection points (6) by gluing, heat sealing or by sewing. This results in the production of cavities (5) which are connected to one another via valves (18) and which can be placed under gas pressure. Connecting parts (7) which only transfer tensile stress are arranged between areas which are comprised of the layers (3, 4) - strips (11, 12) -. When the cavities (5) are placed under a gas pressure which is proportional to the z-acceleration, the suit builds up an application pressure over the tensile stress. The application pressure has a compensating effect thus relieving the pilot's body from the effects of such accelerations. The compensating pressure can be set to the hydrostatic pressure, said hydrostatic pressure being proportional to the acceleration, by appropriately selecting the width of the strips (11, 12) in conjunction with the radius of the covered body parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64D 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A41D 13/02 (2006.01); B64D 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64D 10/00 (2013.01); B64D 2010/002 (2013.01); B64D 2010/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954203A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954203 A1 19991028; AR 014997 A1 20010411; AR 014999 A1 20010411; AT 202527 T 20010715; AT 205147 T 20010915; AU 1478299 A 19991108; AU 3135699 A 19991108; AU 6819098 A 19991108; AU 722331 B2 20000727; AU 730349 B2 20010308; BR 9810067 A 20000905; BR 9810199 A 20000808; BR 9906341 A 20000926; CA 2294364 A1 19991028; CA 2294382 A1 19991028; CA 2294382 C 20071127; CA 2294383 A1 19991028; CA 2294383 C 20080617; CN 1088670 C 20020807; CN 1088671 C 20020807; CN 1088672 C 20020807; CN 1261315 A 20000726; CN 1261316 A 20000726; CN 1266403 A 20000913; DE 59800938 D1 20010802; DE 59801396 D1 20011011; DK 0983190 T3 20010903; DK 0983192 T3 20011119; EG 22340 A 20021231; EP 0983190 A1 20000308; EP 0983190 B1 20010627; EP 0983192 A1 20000308; EP 0983192 B1 20010905; EP 0983193 A1 20000308; ES 2159181 T3 20010916; ES 2161070 T3 20011116; GR 3036152 T3 20010928; GR 3036544 T3 20011231; HK 1029314 A1 20030417; HK 1029315 A1 20030411; HK 1030762 A1 20030417; IL 133066 A 20021110; IL 133066 D0 20010319; IL 133068 A 20031210; IL 133068 D0 20010319; IL 133069 A 20030112; IL 133069 D0 20010319; JO 2145 B 20020807; JP 2000515833 A 20001128; JP 2000516891 A 20001219; JP 2000516892 A 20001219; JP 3393871 B2 20030407; JP 3393873 B2 20030407; JP 3398158 B2 20030421; KR 100379666 B1 20030410; KR 100379667 B1 20030410; KR 20010013231 A 20010226; KR 20010013573 A 20010226; NO 312063 B1 20020311; NO 313692 B1 20021118; NO 314175 B1 20030210; NO 996341 A 20000216; NO 996341 D0 19991220; NO 996343 A 20000216; NO 996343 D0 19991220; NO 996344 A 20000218; NO 996344 D0 19991220; PT 983190 E 20011030; PT 983192 E 20011228; TR 9903137 T1 20001121; TR 9903138 T1 20001121; TR 9903139 T1 20001023; US 6290642 B1 20010918; US 6325754 B1 20011204; US 6419622 B1 20020716; WO 9954200 A1 19991028; WO 9954202 A1 19991028; ZA 9901659 B 19990921; ZA 9902136 B 19991119

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040226

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LSS LIFE SUPPORT SYSTEMS AG

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LSS LIFE SUPPORT SYSTEMS AG

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE