Global Patent Index - EP 0983289 A4

EP 0983289 A4 2001-04-25 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ADJUVANT

Title (en)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ADJUVANT

Title (de)

OLIGONUKLEOTIDHILFSMITTEL

Title (fr)

ADJUVANT OLIGONUCLEOTIDIQUE

Publication

EP 0983289 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98923657 A

Priority

  • US 9810459 W
  • US 4712197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852962A1] The invention provides oligonucleotide adjuvants useful for the generation of both a cell mediated (cytotoxic T lymphocyte) response and an antibody response to an antigen presented by the administration of a vaccine. Vaccine compositions including the adjuvant and methods of vaccination using the adjuvants are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/00; A61K 31/7088; A61K 31/7125; A61K 48/00; C07H 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/29 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/12 (2013.01); A61K 39/292 (2013.01); A61K 39/39 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55505 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55561 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01); C12N 2730/10134 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0468520 A2 19920129 - MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]
  • [A] KLINMAN D M ET AL: "CONTRIBUTION OF CPG MOTIFS TO THE IMMUNOGENICITY OF DNA VACCINES", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY,THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE,US, vol. 158, 1 April 1997 (1997-04-01), pages 3635 - 3639, XP002910242, ISSN: 0022-1767
  • See also references of WO 9852962A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852962 A1 19981126; AU 7589398 A 19981211; CA 2289741 A1 19981126; EP 0983289 A1 20000308; EP 0983289 A4 20010425; JP 2001526688 A 20011218

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-04-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07H 21/00 A, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7A 61K 48/00 B, 7A 61K 31/7088 B, 7A 61K 31/7125 B

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE