Global Patent Index - EP 0983296 A4

EP 0983296 A4 2002-11-06 - RECEPTORS FOR TGF-BETA-RELATED NEUROTROPHIC FACTORS

Title (en)

RECEPTORS FOR TGF-BETA-RELATED NEUROTROPHIC FACTORS

Title (de)

REZEPTOREN FÜR TGF BETA RELATED NEUROTROPHIC FACTORS

Title (fr)

RECEPTEURS DES FACTEURS NEUROTROPHIQUES ASSOCIES AU TGF-BETA

Publication

EP 0983296 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98918515 A

Priority

  • US 9807996 W
  • US 4400797 P
  • US 85998897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846622A1] A novel growth factor receptor, TrnR2, is disclosed and the human and mouse amino acid sequences are identified. Human and mouse TrnR2 cDNA sequences have been cloned and sequenced. Subcloning the cDNA sequences into vectors and the preparation of cells stably transformed with the vectors are also disclosed. In addition, methods for treating degenerative conditions as well as conditions involving excess levels of GDNF or NTN, and methods for detecting and monitoring TrnR2 levels in patients are provided. Methods for identifying additional members of the TrnR family of growth factor receptors are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 1/00; A23J 1/00; A61K 38/24; A61K 38/27; C07K 14/00; C07K 16/00; C07K 17/00; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00; C12P 21/06; G01N 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/71 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/71 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/30 (2013.01); G01N 2333/71 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9744356 A2 19971127 - BIOGEN INC [US], et al
  • [PX] WO 9836072 A1 19980820 - GENENTECH INC [US]
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 21 June 1996 (1996-06-21), HILLIER L. ET AL., XP002210549, retrieved from EBI Database accession no. W73681
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 21 June 1996 (1996-06-21), HILLIER L. ET AL., XP002210550, retrieved from EBI Database accession no. W73633
  • [PX] BALOH ROBERT H ET AL: "TrnR2, a novel receptor that mediates neurturin and GDNF signaling through Ret.", NEURON, vol. 18, no. 5, 1997, pages 793 - 802, XP002210548, ISSN: 0896-6273
  • See also references of WO 9846622A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846622 A1 19981022; AU 7142298 A 19981111; AU 748639 B2 20020606; CA 2291705 A1 19981022; EP 0983296 A1 20000308; EP 0983296 A4 20021106; NZ 501423 A 20020201

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-11-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RECEPTORS FOR TGF-BETA-RELATED NEUROTROPHIC FACTORS

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE