Global Patent Index - EP 0983301 A2

EP 0983301 A2 2000-03-08 - THROMBIN-INHIBITING PEPTIDE

Title (en)

THROMBIN-INHIBITING PEPTIDE

Title (de)

THROMBIN HEMMENDE PEPTIDE

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES INHIBANT LA THROMBINE

Publication

EP 0983301 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98932121 A

Priority

  • DE 19724791 A
  • EP 9803356 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19724791A1] The invention relates to peptides of general formula (I), wherein Y<1>, Y<2> and X<1-14> have the meaning cited in the description. The invention also relates to the use of said peptides in the production of medicaments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/81; A61K 38/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); C07K 14/81 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/811 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855506A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724791 A1 19981210; DE 19724791 B4 20060928; EP 0983301 A2 20000308; JP 2002506432 A 20020226; WO 9855506 A2 19981210; WO 9855506 A3 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090106

2007-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2007-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990923

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE