Global Patent Index - EP 0983388 A1

EP 0983388 A1 2000-03-08 - METHOD FOR DETECTING QUALITATIVE AND QUANTITATIVE ALTERATIONS IN DNA AND LIGANDS OF SAID ALTERATION LIGANDS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETECTING QUALITATIVE AND QUANTITATIVE ALTERATIONS IN DNA AND LIGANDS OF SAID ALTERATION LIGANDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR QUALITATIVEN UND QUANTITATIVEN DETEKTION VON DNA-MODIFIATIONEN SOWIE LIGANDEN DIESER MODIFIKATIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETECTION QUALITATIVE ET QUANTITATIVE D'ALTERATIONS DE L'ADN ET DES LIGANDS DE CES ALTERATIONS

Publication

EP 0983388 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98925754 A

Priority

  • FR 9801008 W
  • FR 9706102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2763600A1] The invention concerns a method for demonstrating an alteration in a DNA sequence, characterised in that: a) said DNA sequence is brought in the presence of a composition comprising at least a compound identifying the type of alteration concerned, called ligand, in a medium ensuring the identification; b) revealing the identification of the alteration by said ligand. The invention is useful for demonstrating the genotoxic properties of a medium by measuring the alteration produced by the medium on the DNA sample, and for demonstrating an alteration of the DNA repair system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C12N 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6827 (2013.01); C12N 15/102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853099A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763600 A1 19981127; FR 2763600 B1 19991112; AU 7775198 A 19981211; CA 2290679 A1 19981126; CN 1214111 C 20050810; CN 1260839 A 20000719; EP 0983388 A1 20000308; JP 2002500511 A 20020108; US 6309838 B1 20011030; WO 9853099 A1 19981126

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101201

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHAUBRON, FRANCK

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PROVOT, CHRISTIAN

2003-02-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR DETECTING QUALITATIVE AND QUANTITATIVE ALTERATIONS IN DNA

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011210

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE