Global Patent Index - EP 0983413 A1

EP 0983413 A1 2000-03-08 - ANTI-THEFT DEVICE FOR LOCKING CONTAINER OR LORRY DOORS

Title (en)

ANTI-THEFT DEVICE FOR LOCKING CONTAINER OR LORRY DOORS

Title (de)

DIEBSTAHLSICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERRIEGELUNG VON TÜREN EINES BEHÄLTERS ODER LASTKRAFTWAGENS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ANTIVOL POUR BLOCAGE DES PORTES D'UN CONTENEUR OU D'UN CAMION

Publication

EP 0983413 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909040 A

Priority

  • FR 9900629 W
  • FR 9803289 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947775A1] The invention concerns an anti-theft device for locking a container or lorry opening comprising at least one door or shutter, said locking device comprising means integral with the lower crosspiece, for receiving a mobile element (54) provided with means for locking the door and a latch actuated by a lock blocking the mobile element (54) in the receiving means, said means receiving the mobile part comprising a box (50) fixed inside the crosspiece and provided in its internal wall with at least one cavity (52) for inserting a latch locking member (53) and the mobile element (54) comprising a part (56) fitted sliding into the box (50), the locking member (53) co-operating with the cavity (52) and being controlled by a safety lock (59). The invention is characterised in that it comprises two mutually parallel locking members (53) and the lock is provided on its rear surface with two cranks, each engaging one of the locking members provided each with a notch for imparting two equal horizontal movements in opposite directions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947775A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947775 A1 19990923; AU 2843199 A 19991011; DE 69908260 D1 20030703; DE 69908260 T2 20040408; EP 0983413 A1 20000308; EP 0983413 B1 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140318

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908260

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140318

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908260

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130925

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-09-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-08-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908260 P 20030703

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030528

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020429

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE