Global Patent Index - EP 0983417 A1

EP 0983417 A1 2000-03-08 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR GUIDING A DRIVE ELEMENT ALONG A SUPPORT RAIL ON A VECHICLE DOOR STRUT

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR GUIDING A DRIVE ELEMENT ALONG A SUPPORT RAIL ON A VECHICLE DOOR STRUT

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FÜHRUNG EINES MITNEHMERS AUF EINEM TRÄGERBLECH EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUG-TÜRMODULS

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT ET PROCEDE POUR GUIDER UN ELEMENT APTE A ENTRAINER UNE FENETRE LE LONG D'UNE ENTRETOISE DE PORTE DE VEHICULE

Publication

EP 0983417 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924046 A

Priority

  • DE 9801183 W
  • DE 19720867 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19720867C1] The fastening system employs one or more round or elongated cup (2) which is pressed, deep drawn or stamped in the door frame (1), the cup is inserted in a hole in the components (4,40), and the head of the cup is deformed and spread to secure the component. Cups can be formed before or after the components are put in place, and heads can be compressed to form a mushroom (22) or flat (23) head. The formed cups can have a change of section (3) so that the thicker area provides location, and the thinner area gives a preferred region for deformation of the head. The system can be used to generate a Tee-section rail.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/38; B60J 5/04; B60R 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/38 (2006.01); B21D 39/03 (2006.01); B23P 11/00 (2006.01); B60J 1/17 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); B60R 13/02 (2006.01); B62D 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/032 (2013.01); B21J 15/046 (2013.01); B21K 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850658A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19720867 C1 19980903; BR 9808745 A 20000711; CN 1077197 C 20020102; CN 1255182 A 20000531; DE 59813047 D1 20051013; EP 0983417 A1 20000308; EP 0983417 B1 20050907; ES 2247696 T3 20060301; JP 2001523313 A 20011120; US 6688043 B1 20040210; WO 9850658 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813047

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070426

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070426

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050907

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247696 T3

2005-12-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813047 P 20051013

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-02-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR GUIDING A DRIVE ELEMENT ALONG A SUPPORT RAIL ON A VECHICLE DOOR STRUT

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE