Global Patent Index - EP 0983422 A1

EP 0983422 A1 2000-03-08 - BEARING ARRANGEMENT FOR A STEAM TURBINE INSTALLATION

Title (en)

BEARING ARRANGEMENT FOR A STEAM TURBINE INSTALLATION

Title (de)

LAGERANORDNUNG FÜR EINE DAMPFTURBINENANLAGE

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE PALIER POUR INSTALLATION A TURBINE A VAPEUR

Publication

EP 0983422 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98933491 A

Priority

  • DE 9801297 W
  • DE 19721317 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853183A1] The invention relates to a steam turbine (1) with an exhaust stem housing (2) whose turbine rotor (10) is arranged in an end bearing (8). The invention seeks to provide high stability in relation to movements of the exhaust steam housing (2) while ensuring specially high rigidity in the end bearing (8). According to the invention, the end bearing (8) is held by a support (24) guided through the exhaust steam housing (2) and resting on a foundation block (22). A detachable condenser (44) allocated to the steam turbine (1) is rigidly connected to the exhaust steam housing (2) in a steam turbine installation (40) which is fitted with one such steam turbine (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/28; F01D 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/16 (2006.01); F01D 25/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/28 (2013.01); F01D 25/162 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853183A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853183 A1 19981126; CZ 292470 B6 20030917; CZ 9904128 A3 20000517; EP 0983422 A1 20000308; EP 0983422 B1 20021002; JP 2001527620 A 20011225; JP 4162723 B2 20081008; US 6231305 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130508

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805811

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130508

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120604

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805811 20021107

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010703

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI