Global Patent Index - EP 0983470 A1

EP 0983470 A1 2000-03-08 - PARTIAL OR COMPLETE USE OF A PRESSURIZED GAS CYLINDER KNOWN PER SE FOR COMPRESSED, LIQUEFIED OR DISSOLVED GASES

Title (en)

PARTIAL OR COMPLETE USE OF A PRESSURIZED GAS CYLINDER KNOWN PER SE FOR COMPRESSED, LIQUEFIED OR DISSOLVED GASES

Title (de)

TEILWEISE ODER VOLLSTÄNDIGE VERWENDUNG EINER AN SICH BEKANNTEN DRUCKGASFLASCHE FÜR VERDICHTETE, VERFLÜSSIGTE ODER GELÖSTE GASE

Title (fr)

UTILISATION PARTIELLE OU TOTALE D'UNE BOUTEILLE A GAZ SOUS PRESSION CONNUE EN SOI POUR DES GAZ COMPRIMES, LIQUEFIES OU DISSOUS

Publication

EP 0983470 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924269 A

Priority

  • DE 19721128 A
  • EP 9802603 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19721128A1] The invention relates to the partial or complete use of a pressurized gas cylinder known per se for compressed, liquefied or dissolved gases as a liner for a composite cylinder. This enables production costs of a composite cylinder to be reduced by 1/3 when compared to the costs arising from the production of a new composite cylinder using current manufacturing technologies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 5/08 (2006.01); B23B 25/06 (2006.01); B65D 6/08 (2006.01); B65D 6/10 (2006.01); F17C 1/00 (2006.01); F17C 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 1/06 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0104 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2201/056 (2013.01); F17C 2201/058 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0604 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0619 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0639 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0643 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0646 (2013.01); F17C 2203/066 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0663 (2013.01); F17C 2209/2154 (2013.01); F17C 2209/2172 (2013.01); F17C 2209/232 (2013.01); F17C 2221/01 (2013.01); F17C 2221/03 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0153 (2013.01); F17C 2223/036 (2013.01); F17C 2260/048 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49716 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49718 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49751 (2013.01); Y10T 409/30756 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853245A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19721128 A1 19981126; AT 221973 T 20020815; AU 745651 B2 20020328; AU 7652298 A 19981211; BG 103845 A 20000531; BG 63923 B1 20030630; BR 9809863 A 20000627; CA 2289076 A1 19981126; CN 1113182 C 20030702; CN 1257570 A 20000621; CZ 299964 B6 20090107; CZ 9904055 A3 20010214; EP 0983470 A1 20000308; EP 0983470 B1 20020807; ES 2182314 T3 20030301; HR P980239 A2 19990228; HR P980239 B1 20030430; HU 0002107 A2 20001128; HU 0002107 A3 20010129; ID 22934 A 19991216; JP 2001525913 A 20011211; KR 20010020360 A 20010315; NO 311458 B1 20011126; NO 995604 A 19991115; NO 995604 D0 19991115; PL 194323 B1 20070531; PL 336904 A1 20000717; SK 154699 A3 20000612; SK 283964 B6 20040608; TR 9902824 T2 20000221; US 2002070222 A1 20020613; US 6363597 B1 20020402; US 6810567 B2 20041102; WO 9853245 A1 19981126; YU 49371 B 20050919; YU 53099 A 20011226; ZA 9804129 B 19981125

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090502

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090504

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090504

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080502

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090502

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080502

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MESSER GRIESHEIM G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20070826

2008-02-06 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20070826

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070709

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070514

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070503

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-03-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-03-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-03-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-06-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-05-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2005-03-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-03-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 0983470E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-07-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-02 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2182314

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-12-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-11-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-11-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-11-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-10-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805114

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-12

2002-09-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: MK PAYMENT 19991220;RO PAYMENT 19991220;SI PAYMENT 19991220

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 221973

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: MK PAYMENT 19991220;RO PAYMENT 19991220;SI PAYMENT 19991220