Global Patent Index - EP 0983555 A1

EP 0983555 A1 2000-03-08 - ADDRESSING SCHEME FOR DOUBLING THE TRANSMISSION CAPACITY OF A MASTER-CONTROLLED SLAVE-TO-SLAVE COMMUNICATION IN ANY KIND OF BUS SYSTEM

Title (en)

ADDRESSING SCHEME FOR DOUBLING THE TRANSMISSION CAPACITY OF A MASTER-CONTROLLED SLAVE-TO-SLAVE COMMUNICATION IN ANY KIND OF BUS SYSTEM

Title (de)

ADRESSIERUNGSSCHEMA ZUR VERDOPPELUNG DER ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEISTUNG EINER MASTERGESTEUERTEN SLAVE-TO-SLAVE-KOMMUNIKATION IN EINEM BELIEBIGEN BUSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SCHEMA D'ADRESSAGE PERMETTANT DE DOUBLER LA PUISSANCE DE TRANSMISSION D'UNE COMMUNICATION ESCLAVE-ESCLAVE COMMANDEE PAR LE MAITRE DANS UN SYSTEME DE BUS QUELCONQUE

Publication

EP 0983555 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98917033 A

Priority

EP 9801644 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949397A1] The invention relates to an addressing scheme for doubling the transmission capacity of a master-controlled slave-to-slave communication in any kind of bus system which makes it possible to transmit data from one slave to a second slave on a bus within a bus cycle controlled by a bus master. This is achieved simply by way of a special address assignment so that the invention can be used with any address-controlled bus system, such as PCI, ISA, EPP. The description distinguishes between indirect read access, inverse indirect read access and indirect write access as variants of the addressing scheme. These three variants differ in terms of the direction of transmission between the participating slaves a and b and the hardware required for implementation. Normal bus access remains possible without restrictions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 13/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/4213 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949397A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949397 A1 19990930; AU 7039398 A 19991018; EP 0983555 A1 20000308

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DSPECIALISTS DIGITALE AUDIO- UND MESSSYSTEME GMBH

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DSPECIALISTS DIGITALE AUDIO- UND MESSSYSTEME GMBH

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040223

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DSPECIALISTS GESELLSCHAFT FUER INNOVATIVE SIGNALVE

2002-08-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DSPECIALISTS GESELLSCHAFT FUER INNOVATIVE SIGNALVE

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT