Global Patent Index - EP 0983567 A1

EP 0983567 A1 2000-03-08 - CARD PACKAGE PRODUCTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

CARD PACKAGE PRODUCTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

KARTENVERPACKUNGSPRODUKTIONSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PRODUCTION D'EMBALLAGES DE CARTES

Publication

EP 0983567 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923533 A

Priority

  • US 9810246 W
  • US 4718997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853419A1] A card package production system (30) for producing card packages each with at least one card bearing card information at a plurality of different card information locations on the card with a card multireader (54) having an elongate card track (52) with a succession of reading stations located along the track (52) with readers for respectively reading the card information at the different locations on the card with means for simultaneously sliding a plurality of the cards along the track (52) in seriatim relationship through the succession of reading stations of the multireader (54) for simultaneous reading of the card information at the different locations on the cards by the multireader (54).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 5/00; B32B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 13/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853419 A1 19981126; CA 2290828 A1 19981126; EP 0983567 A1 20000308; EP 0983567 A4 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031212

2001-01-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06K 5/00 A, 7B 32B 31/00 B, 7G 06K 17/00 B, 7G 06K 7/00 B

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRETL, ROBERT, J.

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRETL, JAMES, G.

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991215

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT