Global patent index - EP 0983618 A1

EP 0983618 A1 2000-03-08 - SAFETY DEVICE AT CONNECTORS TO ELECTRIC CURRENT RAILS, INSTALLATION CHANNELS AND THE LIKE

Title (en)

SAFETY DEVICE AT CONNECTORS TO ELECTRIC CURRENT RAILS, INSTALLATION CHANNELS AND THE LIKE

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN VERBINDERN MIT STROMSCHIENEN, INSTALLATIONSKANÄLEN UND ÄHNLICHEN.

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE DE CONNECTEURS DESTINES A DES RAILS DE COURANT ELECTRIQUE, CANAUX D'INSTALLATION ET EQUIVALENT

Publication

EP 0983618 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923291 A

Priority

  • SE 9800958 W
  • SE 9701901 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853533A1] The present invention relates to a safety device (1; 1'; 1'') at a connector device (3; 3'; 3''), provided with electric connectors (13, 13'). The one end of the device, which is inserted into the current rail is conditionally position secured by means of first locking means (19), which accomplishes an electric contact closure between the rail and the device. Second locking means at the other end of the device locks completely the device, when it has been inserted into the rail. According to the invention said second locking means are provided with blocking means (29, 29'), which block the connectors against connection to power consumption (35), until said second locking means have been activated and lock the device, which has been completely inserted into the rail, in relation to the rail, while an automatic release of the connectors is accomplished. The removal of the device necessitates a removal of power-consuming connections from the device, and then said second locking means is inactivated, while an automatic activation of said blocking mechanism results, which also makes it impossible, via said second locking means, to insert either one of the ends of the connector device into the rail, if they are not activated and inactivated respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 25/14; H01R 13/447

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/14 (2006.01); H01R 13/44 (2006.01); H01R 13/447 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/142 (2013.01); H01R 13/44 (2013.01); H01R 13/447 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853533A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853533 A1 19981126; AU 7561798 A 19981211; DE 69821614 D1 20040318; DE 69821614 T2 20050105; EP 0983618 A1 20000308; EP 0983618 B1 20040211; ES 2218823 T3 20041116; SE 513827 C2 20001113; SE 9701901 D0 19970522; SE 9701901 L 19981123

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-07 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2009-10-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2009-03-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SKANSKA SVERIGE AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20081218

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2218823

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69821614

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEXIO AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WIDELL, HARALD

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WIDELL, JAN

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BERGMAN, NILS-AKE

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991113

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE