Global Patent Index - EP 0983680 A1

EP 0983680 A1 2000-03-08 - METHOD FOR DISCOUNTING TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DISCOUNTING TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR RABATTIERUNG VON TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'OBTENTION DE RABAIS SUR DES SERVICES DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Publication

EP 0983680 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930712 A

Priority

  • EP 98930712 A
  • EP 9802973 W
  • EP 97108323 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853596A1] The aim of the invention is to provide a method of supporting on-line or off-line discounting and/or on-line administration of discounting. To this end, a call is evaluated as a discount call at the exchange.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/83 (2013.01); H04M 15/00 (2013.01); H04M 15/8083 (2013.01); H04M 2215/0184 (2013.01); H04M 2215/82 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853596A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853596 A1 19981126; EP 0983680 A1 20000308

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081201

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030827

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT