Global Patent Index - EP 0983694 A1

EP 0983694 A1 2000-03-08 - BOUNDARY SECTOR HARD HANDOFF TRIGGER

Title (en)

BOUNDARY SECTOR HARD HANDOFF TRIGGER

Title (de)

AUSLÖSER VON HARTEM WEITERREICHEN AN DER SEKTORGRENZE

Title (fr)

DECLENCHEUR DE TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE A SOLUTION DE CONTINUITE DANS LES SECTEURS LIMITROPHES

Publication

EP 0983694 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920236 A

Priority

  • US 9809132 W
  • US 85859397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853620A1] A method and system for triggering hard handoff of a call from a CDMA network cell operating on a first frequency to a cell operating on at least one second frequency or in an AMPS network are disclosed. In a departure from the art, a boundary sector handoff trigger is implemented in two stages. The first stage of the trigger occurs when the active set of a mobile unit consists only of pilots identified as boundary pilots; that is, the active set comprises a "boundary active set." Once the requirements for the first stage are satisfied, a second stage of the boundary sector trigger of the present invention is enabled. During the second stage, a round-trip delay ("RTD") of communications between the mobile unit and the BTS to which it is nearest is monitored and once the RTD exceeds a predetermined threshold, the trigger is complete and handoff processing continues with target selection and handoff execution.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/14 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/32 (2013.01); H04W 36/14 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853620 A1 19981126; AU 7285598 A 19981211; AU 735575 B2 20010712; CA 2290517 A1 19981126; CN 1265253 A 20000830; EP 0983694 A1 20000308; EP 0983694 A4 20020123

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020625

2002-01-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOETTGER, DAVID

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JALALI, AMHAD

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991130

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB