Global Patent Index - EP 0983732 A3

EP 0983732 A3 2000-06-07 - Device for stamping eyelets on a textile or plastic web

Title (en)

Device for stamping eyelets on a textile or plastic web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einsetzen von mittels eines Nietverbundes zusammengehaltenen Teilen, etwa von Ösen in eine Textil- oder Kunststoffbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la mise en place de moyens assemblés par sertissage, tel que des oeillets, sur une nappe textile ou synthétique

Publication

EP 0983732 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115846 A

Priority

DE 29815610 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0983732A2] The device comprises a lower tool (2) and drop-down upper tool (1). An inlet guide associated with the lower tool comprises an inlet yoke (5) with interconnected arms, surrounding the lower tool at one end, whereby the arms form a guide gap (10) for supplying the parts to the lower tool. An inlet guide rod (14) interacting with the yoke is operated to allow the yoke to lift up so far that a part to be supplied to the lower tool is brought into its appropriate position. The device comprises a lower tool (2) and drop-down upper tool (1). The inlet guide associated with the lower tool comprises an inlet yoke (5) comprising interconnected arms and surrounding the lower tool at one end whereby the arms form a guide gap (10) for supplying the parts to the lower tool. An inlet guide rod (14) interacting with the yoke is operated to allow the yoke to lift up so far that a part to be supplied to the lower tool is brought into its appropriate position. After lowering the yoke this part is mounted in the position for engagement by the tool. When the yoke is raised the guide rod (14) moves the part from the supply path (11) into its specific position in the guide gap (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41H 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41H 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41H 37/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815610 U1 20000113; EP 0983732 A2 20000308; EP 0983732 A3 20000607; PL 190292 B1 20051130; PL 335179 A1 20000313

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI