Global Patent Index - EP 0983734 A1

EP 0983734 A1 2000-03-08 - Shoe sole structures with tapering thickness in a horizontal plane

Title (en)

Shoe sole structures with tapering thickness in a horizontal plane

Title (de)

Schuhsolenstrukturen mit sich verjüngender Dicke in einer horizontalen Ebene

Title (fr)

Structures de semelles de chaussures avec une épaisseur de profil conique dans un plan horizontal

Publication

EP 0983734 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99204164 A

Priority

  • EP 97250029 A
  • EP 89909337 A
  • US 21938788 A
  • US 23966788 A

Abstract (en)

A construction for a shoe (20), particularly an athletic shoe such as a running shoe, includes a sole (28) provided with at least one bulge having concavely rounded inner and outer surfaces (30, 31). The bulge may be located on a side of the shoe sole (28) at a location which substantially corresponds to the location of one of the essential structural support and propulsion elements of an intended wearer's foot when inside the shoe. The thickness of the bulge decreases gradually in at least one of an anterior or posterior direction to a lesser thickness, as viewed in a horizontal plane when the shoe sole (28) is in an upright, unloaded condition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 13/18; A43B 5/00; A43B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/06 (2006.01); A43B 13/04 (2006.01); A43B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/125 (2013.01); A43B 5/00 (2013.01); A43B 5/06 (2013.01); A43B 13/141 (2013.01); A43B 13/143 (2013.01); A43B 13/145 (2013.01); A43B 13/146 (2013.01); A43B 13/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9000358 A1 19900125; AT 158479 T 19971015; AT 206884 T 20011115; AT 207316 T 20011115; AT 209867 T 20011215; AU 4060989 A 19900205; AU 641126 B2 19930916; CA 1340997 C 20000516; CA 1341238 C 20010522; DE 68928347 D1 19971030; DE 68928347 T2 19980129; DE 68929335 D1 20011122; DE 68929335 T2 20020704; DE 68929338 D1 20011129; DE 68929338 T2 20020912; DE 68929355 D1 20020117; DE 68929355 T2 20021017; EP 0424471 A1 19910502; EP 0424471 A4 19911016; EP 0424471 B1 19970924; EP 0811330 A2 19971210; EP 0811330 A3 19990616; EP 0811330 B1 20011017; EP 0983734 A1 20000308; EP 0983734 B1 20011024; EP 1034714 A2 20000913; EP 1034714 A3 20010530; EP 1038457 A1 20000927; EP 1038457 B1 20011205; EP 1104658 A1 20010606; EP 1199001 A1 20020424; ES 2166631 T3 20020416; HK 1028939 A1 20020531; HK 1031178 A1 20020524; JP 2000000102 A 20000107; JP 2000023705 A 20000125; JP 2002101905 A 20020409; JP 3079182 B2 20000821; JP 3138770 B2 20010226; JP 3248151 B2 20020121; JP 3312340 B2 20020805; JP H04500615 A 19920206; NZ 229949 A 19921223

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040409

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030714

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ANATOMIC RESEARCH INC.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030714

2002-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ADIDAS INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2002-09-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-08-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-08-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020830

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020830

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-08-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-08-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-08-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ADIDAS INTERNATIONAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20020621

2002-08-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020812

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-07-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020714

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2002-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166631 T3

2002-03-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-01-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68929338 20011129

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 424471

2001-10-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 811330

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2001-10-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 207316 T 20011115

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-03-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 424471

2000-03-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 811330

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE