Global Patent Index - EP 0983744 A2

EP 0983744 A2 2000-03-08 - Cleaning mop

Title (en)

Cleaning mop

Title (de)

Reinigungsmop

Title (fr)

Balai à franges

Publication

EP 0983744 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115456 A

Priority

DE 19840480 A

Abstract (en)

The floor cleaning mop head is fitted with a mop cloth with end pockets (4) where each has an insertion slit (6) parallel to the pocket openings (5), to take an end section of the mop head holder. The slit (6) length is shorter than the pocket opening (5).

Abstract (de)

Reinigungsmop, der an einer Seite einen Reinigungsflor und an der gegenüberliegenden Seite zwei an den Seitenendbereichen vorgesehene, zueinander hin offene Aufnahmetaschen aufweist, die mittels aufgesetzter Taschenlagen gebildet sind und in die die Endabschnitte eines vorzugsweise klappbaren Mophalters einsteckbar sind, wobei jede Taschenlage wenigstens einen sich parallel zur Taschenöffnung erstreckenden, in die Tasche führenden Einsteckschlitz aufweist, in den die Endabschnitte des Mophalters einsteckbar sind und der in seiner Länge kürzer bemessen ist als die Taschenöffnung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/18 (2006.01); A47L 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/18 (2013.01); A47L 13/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983744 A2 20000308; EP 0983744 A3 20010816; DE 19840480 A1 20000504; DE 19840480 C2 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020217

2002-06-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI