Global patent index - EP 0983778 A1

EP 0983778 A1 2000-03-08 - Dismountable stop device for a slidable body of a ski binding

Title (en)

Dismountable stop device for a slidable body of a ski binding

Title (de)

Lösbarer Anschlag für einen veschiebbaren Skibindungskörper

Title (fr)

Butée démontable pour corps coulissant de fixation de ski

Publication

EP 0983778 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402114 A

Priority

FR 9811049 A

Abstract (en)

The ski boot fastening consists of a clamp mounted on a body (2) that can move lengthwise in a slideway, and a stop (11) to prevent it coming out. The stop is situated at the rear end of the slideway and comprises a detachable component (14) attached to an intermediate member (13) by locking elements. The intermediate member is located beneath the slideway, while the detachable component extends to the rear above it.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de retenue d'une chaussure à un ski ou similaire du type comprenant une mâchoire de retenue montée sur un corps (2) mobile en translation longitudinale dans une glissière fixée au ski, et qui comprend une butée (11) destinée à empêcher ledit corps (2) de sortir de la glissière par déplacement longitudinal, ladite butée (11) se trouvant dans la zone de déplacement vers l'arrière du corps (2) caractérisé en ce que la butée (11) est constitué par une pièce d'extrémité arrière (14) démontable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983778 A1 20000308; EP 0983778 B1 20010627; AT 202495 T 20010715; DE 69900167 D1 20010802; DE 69900167 T2 20020307; FR 2782653 A1 20000303; FR 2782653 B1 20001103; US 6126190 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69900167

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090823

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-06-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900167

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-02

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 202495

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI