Global Patent Index - EP 0983800 A2

EP 0983800 A2 2000-03-08 - Gluing apparatus in particular for gluing cockpits in motor vehicles

Title (en)

Gluing apparatus in particular for gluing cockpits in motor vehicles

Title (de)

Verklebevorrichtung, insbesondere zur Cockpitverklebung in Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Dipositif d'encollage, en particulier pour les cockpits de véhicules à moteur

Publication

EP 0983800 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116162 A

Priority

DE 19840130 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has an adhesive application head (11) that is moved by an electric motor and that carries an adhesive application nozzle (12). An electrical position switch (17) with a switching vane (20) for switching off the head is mounted on the head so that the switching vane or a sensor element (21) connected to it precedes the nozzle in its direction of motion.

Abstract (de)

Eine Verklebevorrichtung, insbesondere zur Cockpitverklebung in Kraftfahrzeugen, besitzt einen eine Kleberdüse (12) tragenden, elektromotorisch bewegbaren Kleberauftragkopf (11). An dem Kleberauftragkopf (11) ist ein zum Abschalten des Kleberauftragkopfes (11) dienender elektrischer Positionsschalter (17) mit Schaltfahne (20,21) angeordnet, derart, daß die Schaltfahne (20) oder ein mit dieser verbundenes Tastelement (21) der Kleberdüse (12) in Bewegungsrichtung derselben vorauseilt. Hierdurch gelingt es mit einfachen Mitteln, Beschädigungen des Kleberauftragkopfes (11) und dadurch bedingte Ausfallzeiten der gesamten Verklebeanlage zu vermeiden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0216 (2013.01); B05C 11/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983800 A2 20000308; EP 0983800 A3 20040331; DE 19840130 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2005-01-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI