Global patent index - EP 0983812 A1

EP 0983812 A1 2000-03-08 - Process for the application of a release or lubricating agent

Title (en)

Process for the application of a release or lubricating agent

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Applikation eines Trenn- oder Schmierstoffs

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'application d'un agent de démoulage ou de lubrification

Publication

EP 0983812 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109269 A

Priority

DE 19840869 A

Abstract (en)

The method consists of production and assembly of a mold, evaporation of a separation agent, introduction of the evaporated separation agent into the mold cavity, and filling of the latter with casting material after at least partial cond-ensation of the separating agent on the surface of the mold cavity. An Independent claim is also included for a casting installation which incorporates means for evaporating a separation agent and introducing it into the mold cavity.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Verfahren zur Applikation eines Trenn- oder Schmierstoffs auf die Oberfläche eines Gießkolbens und/oder die Innenwandung einer Gießkammer, eines Gießkanals und/oder eines Formhohlraums einer Druckgießmaschine. Bei diesem Verfahren wird der Trenn- oder Schmierstoff außerhalb der Druckgießeinheit verdampft, beispielsweise in einem separaten Trennstoff-Verdampfer. Der verdampfte Trenn- oder Schmierstoff wird dann bei geschlossener Gießform in die Druckgießeinheit eingeleitet, und es wird eine zumindest partielle Kondensation des Trenn- oder Schmierstoffs auf der Gießkolben-Oberfläche und/oder zumindest einer Innenwandung der Druckgießeinheit abgewartet. Der Trenn- oder Schmierstoff besteht aus einer Substanz oder mehreren Substanzen, deren jeweilige Verdampfungstemperatur bei Atmosphärendruck höher ist als die Temperatur der besagten Oberfläche und/oder zumindest einer Innenwandung zum Zeitpunkt der Einleitung in die Druckgießeinheit. Beschrieben wird auch ein entsprechendes Druckgießverfahren sowie eine Druckgießanlage zur Durchführung des Druckgießverfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 3/00 (2006.01); B22C 9/12 (2006.01); B22C 23/02 (2006.01); B22D 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/2007 (2013.01); B22C 3/00 (2013.01); B22C 9/12 (2013.01); B22C 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5662156 A 19970902 - FREEMAN LEWIS GENE [US]
  • [AD] BEDNARECK H: "VERBESSERTE KOLBENSCHMIERUNG BEIM DRUCKGIESSEN - ERFAHRUNGEN MIT TRENNSTOFF-PELLETS UND EINEM PASSENDEN DOSIERGERAET", GIESSEREI,DE,GIESSEREI VERLAG. DUSSELDORF, vol. 84, no. 17, pages 43-46, XP000703831, ISSN: 0016-9765
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 02 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906770 A1 20000302; DE 19906770 C2 20030327; AT 228410 T 20021215; EP 0983812 A1 20000308; EP 0983812 B1 20021127; ES 2186276 T3 20030501; JP 2000071055 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140527

2016-02-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160205

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140526

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140526

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140526

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59903523

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140527

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140526

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 228410

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59903523

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130604

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2186276

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021219

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903523

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-09

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 228410

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020208

2001-05-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI