Global Patent Index - EP 0983825 A2

EP 0983825 A2 2000-03-08 - Cup-shaped brush

Title (en)

Cup-shaped brush

Title (de)

Kopfbürste

Title (fr)

Brosse boisseau

Publication

EP 0983825 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117166 A

Priority

DE 29815609 U

Abstract (en)

The head brush (1) has a number of grinding bristle clusters (10,11) held as trimming material (3) in a baseplate (2) so that their other ends form the trimming surface (4) of the brush. The trimming surfaces is shaped. Its shaping deviates from a constant straight line (L). At least some of the bristle clusters project at an angle from the baseplate. Their angle is between (5 degrees ,30 degrees ) from a theoretical axis (X) projecting orthogonally from the plane of the baseplate.

Abstract (de)

Kopfbürste mit einer Vielzahl von Schleifborstenbündeln (10, 11), welche als Besatzmaterial (3) mit ihrem einen Ende in einer Grundplatte (2) gehalten sind und mit ihrem anderen Ende die Besatzoberfläche (4) der Kopfbürste (1) bilden, wobei die Besatzoberfläche (4) profiliert ist, wobei die Profilierung der Besatzoberfläche (4) von einer stetigen, geraden Linie (L) abweicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 13/10; A46B 9/02; B24D 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/00 (2006.01); B24D 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/00 (2013.01); B24D 13/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815609 U1 19981126; AT 268248 T 20040615; EP 0983825 A2 20000308; EP 0983825 A3 20021016; EP 0983825 B1 20040602; ES 2193010 T1 20031101; ES 2193010 T3 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080902

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071027

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193010 T3

2004-12-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909636 P 20040708

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 24D 13/10 A, 7B 24D 13/14 B, 7A 46B 9/02 B, 7B 24B 9/00 B, 7B 24B 9/02 -, 7B 24B 5/44 -

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI