Global Patent Index - EP 0983829 A1

EP 0983829 A1 2000-03-08 - Method and apparatus for gluing strips of veneer

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for gluing strips of veneer

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verkleben von Furnierstreifen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour le collage de feuilles de placage

Publication

EP 0983829 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116423 A

Priority

  • EP 98116423 A
  • DE 19737593 A

Abstract (en)

In a method for bonding veneer or similar wood strips together at their adjoining edges a curable adhesive is applied to at least one of the edges and as the edges are pressed together the adhesive is cured by microwave energy with a wavelength of 10 cm-1 mm in a vacuum. Process equipment comprises a feed unit(1) for the veneer strips, adhesive applicator, microwave energy generator and a mechanism for pressing the strips together.

Abstract (de)

Ein erfindungsgemäßes Verfahren zum Verkleben von Furnierstreifen umfaßt das Aufbringen eines Klebstoffs an mindestens einer Stoßkante eines Furnierstreifens, das Zusammendrücken der Furnierstreifen an den Stoßkanten und das Härten des Klebstoffs mittels elektromagnetischer Wellen, wobei das Zusammendrücken der Furnierstreifen und das Härten des Klebstoffs gleichzeitig erfolgt. Eine erfindungsgemäße Vorrichtung umfaßt eine Aushärteinheit 3, in der eine Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung elektromagnetischer Wellen und Mittel zum Zusammendrücken der Furniersteifen vorgesehen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27D 1/10; H05B 6/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27D 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27D 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0830924 A2 19980325 - MEINAN MACHINERY WORKS [JP]
  • [Y] US 5364333 A 19941115 - GULLIVER RICHARD F [US], et al
  • [Y] DE 3304315 A1 19840809 - KUPER HEINRICH GMBH CO KG [DE]
  • [X] WO 9605035 A1 19960222 - SCHILCHER INDUSTRIEANLAGEN UND [AT], et al
  • [A] BE 487545 A
  • [A] WO 9627482 A1 19960912 - STENLUND MASKINER AB [SE], et al
  • [A] US 3021248 A 19620213 - MANN JULIUS W, et al
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 045 (C - 268) 26 February 1985 (1985-02-26)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 205 (C - 299) 22 August 1985 (1985-08-22)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 349 (C - 0967) 28 July 1992 (1992-07-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 532 (M - 1051) 22 November 1990 (1990-11-22)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 380 (E - 0965) 16 August 1990 (1990-08-16)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DK ES FI FR IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19737593 C1 19990304; DK 0983829 T3 20061009; EP 0983829 A1 20000308; EP 0983829 B1 20060607; ES 2264807 T3 20070116

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090901

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-03-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2264807 T3

2007-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061107

2006-10-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-09-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2006-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DK ES FI FR IT LI PT SE

2003-11-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DK ES FI FR IT LI PT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DK ES FI FR IT LI PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI